Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Kishner, Joanna S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing Blocked Account Upon Court's inquiry, Mr. Leonard stated proof of blocked account was filed yesterday. Court confirmed. Judge: Kishner, Joanna S. |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing Blocked Account Judge: Kishner, Joanna S. |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Blocked Account Doc ID# 6 [6] Proof of Blocked Account |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Doc ID# 5 [5] Court's Memo RE: Remote Appearance Information for AUGUST 25, 2022, Hearing **PLEASE REVIEW IN ITS ENTIRETY** |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account Upon Court's inquiry, Mr. Leonard stated he had not received the check and therefore, could not make a deposit. Mr. Leonard further stated Defense Counsel ordered the check and there was an underlying case. Court NOTED the case was opened on March 30, 2021, minor still had not received funds and a blocked account should have been opened within 30 days. Court recessed and recalled the matter for Mr. Leonard to retrieve an email from Defense Counsel. Mr. Leonard stated he received the settlement draft yesterday and believed Defense Counsel did not request the check until the Order regarding the minor's compromise was approved. Mr. Leonard asserted he had no excuse as to why it took from March 2021 to June 2022 to work on the case. Mr. Leonard volunteered to make a 501c3 donation to a charity that engaged in legal services in lieu of a sanctions hearings for non-compliance. Court DIRECTED Counsel to provide proof of said donation within two (2) weeks. Mr. Leonard confirmed Defense Counsel had the check and the parties would exchange documents. Court SET the matter for an ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("OSC") HEARING and required Defense Counsel's appearance. Mr. Leonard to send Defense Counsel minutes of today's hearing and notify of upcoming hearing. The Court would evaluate vacating the OSC hearing if proof of the blocked account was filed. 8/25/22 9:00 A.M. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: BLOCKED ACCOUNT Judge: Kishner, Joanna S. |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Doc ID# 4 [4] Order Approving Minor's Compromise |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Doc ID# 3 [3] Second Amended Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Doc ID# 2 [2] Amended Petition for Compromise of a Minor's Claim |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Doc ID# 1 [1] Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.