Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Darren T. Brenner, against Chicago Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Ticor Title Of Nevada, Inc., represented by Janet Trost, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Sturman, Gloria presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Tort |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Doc ID# 26 [26] Stipulation And Order To Dismiss Case With Prejudice |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Report Doc ID# 25 [25] Joint Status Report |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Report Doc ID# 24 [24] Joint Status Report |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Report Doc ID# 23 [23] Joint Status Report |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents The Court was advised this matter settled on February 27, 2023, and this matter was on the Court s Chambers calendar to review for closing papers. As no closing papers are on file, this matter is continued to the Chambers calendar. If closing papers not on file by that date, the Court will set a hearing to show cause why the matter should not be administratively closed. CONTINUED TO: 6/5/23 3:00 AM (CHAMBERS) STATUS CHECK: SETTLEMENT DOCUMENTS CLERK'S NOTE: The above minute order has been distributed to all registered parties via Odyssey File and Serve.//ks 5/3/23 Judge: Sturman, Gloria |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents The Court was advised this matter settled on February 27, 2023, and this matter was on the Court s Chambers calendar to review for closing papers. As no closing papers are on file, this matter is continued to the Chambers calendar. If closing papers not on file by that date, the Court will set a hearing to show cause why the matter should not be administratively closed. CONTINUED TO: 6/5/23 3:00 AM (CHAMBERS) STATUS CHECK: SETTLEMENT DOCUMENTS CLERK'S NOTE: The above minute order has been distributed to all registered parties via Odyssey File and Serve.//ks 5/3/23 Judge: Sturman, Gloria |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents
Judge: Sturman, Gloria |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 22 [22] Notice of Settlement |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 21 [21] Notice of Change of Designation of Local Counsel for Service of Process Only Per SCR 42.1 |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Doc ID# 20 [20] Stipulation and Order for Temporary Stay of Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.