Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Intentional Misconduct case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Gayle Nathan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryIntentional Misconduct |
Last RefreshedSeptember 02, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: s Escobar, Adriana, Escobar, Adriana |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Escobar, Adriana |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Conference
Judge: Escobar, Adriana |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Rule 16 Conference Gayle Nathan, Esq. and Timothy Treffinger, Esq. present via Bluejeans video conference. The Court reviewed Joint Case Conference Report (JCCR). Counsel anticipated five days to try. COURT ORDERED, matter SET for trial; matter SET for status check. 09.01.2021 10:00 AM STATUS CHECK: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 01.20.2022 2:00 PM CALENDAR CALL 02.07.2022 9:30 AM BENCH TRIAL Judge: Escobar, Adriana |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Rule 16 Conference
Judge: Escobar, Adriana |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Rule 16 Conference Order Doc ID# 24 [24] Mandatory Rule 16 Pretrial Scheduling Conference Order |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Rule 16 Conference Order Mandatory Rule 16 Pretrial Scheduling Conference Order |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Joint Case Conference Report Doc ID# 23 [23] Joint Case Conference Report |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Joint Case Conference Report | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Early Case Conference Doc ID# 22 [22] Notice of Early Case Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.