Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Kephart, William D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedFebruary 06, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account
Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account
Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 1 Judicial Reassignment to Judge Bita Yeager |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Contribution Pursuant to December 7, 2020 Order Granting Petition for Compromise of a Minor's Claim Pursuant to NRS 41.200 | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granting Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim Pursuant to NRS 41.200 | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition to Compromise Minor's Claim COURT ORDERED, Petition to Compromise Minor s Claim is GRANTED pursuant to EDCR 2.20, NRS 41.200 and NRS 41.200(5)(8). Status Check scheduled for 2/25/2021 @ 3AM to confirm deposit of funds into blocked account/college 529 plan. Status Check Scheduled for2/4/2021 @ 3AM regarding depositing funds into blocked account/college 529 plan. Judge: Kephart, William D. |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Notice of Hearing | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Compromise of a Minor's Claim Pursuant to NRS 41.200 | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.