Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Preciado-Paz, Gonzalo, filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case against Ascend Llc, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Kephart, William D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2020 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Disburse Funds From Compromise of Minors Claim Doc ID# 6 [6] Order to Disburse Funds from Compromise of Minor's Claim |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition to Disburse Money From Compromise of Minors Claim Doc ID# 5 [5] Petition to Disburse |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Doc ID# 4 [4] Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account As proof of establishment of a blocked account has been provided, matter is OFF CALENDAR. Final Disposition, DISMISSED. CASE CLOSED. Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account
Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 1 Judicial Reassignment to Judge Bita Yeager |
|
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Doc ID# 3 [3] Affidavit of Establishment of Minor's Blocked Account |
|
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Establishment of Minor's Blocked Account | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Doc ID# 2 [2] Order Approving Compromise of Claim of Minor |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Order Approving Compromise of Claim of Minor |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.