Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Panther Swc, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jeffrey A. Bendavid, against Cenegenics L.L.C., in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Kephart, William D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2020 |
CategoryOther Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment Plus Interest |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 19 [19] Notice of Entry of Order Granting Judgment Debtor Exam of Cenegenics, L.L.C. |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 18 [18] Order Granting Application for Judgment Debtor Exam of Cenegenics, LLC |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Examination of Judgment Debtor Vacated Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Application for Examination of Judgment Debtor Upon review of the papers and pleadings on file in this Matter, as proper service has been provided, this Court notes no opposition has been filed. Accordingly, pursuant to EDCR 2.20(e) the Application for Examination of Judgment Debtor is deemed unopposed. Therefore, good cause appearing, COURT ORDERED, application is GRANTED. The Court hereby requests moving counsel to prepare the Order and submit it to the Court for signature within fourteen (14) days. Because this matter has been decided on the pleadings, the hearing set for June 3, 2021 will be taken off calendar, as there is consequently no need for any parties or attorneys to appear. CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was distributed via the E-Service list. / mlt Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Application for Examination of Judgment Debtor COURT ORDERED, Default Judgment GRANTED pursuant to EDCR 2.20 and NRCP 55. Scott Goldstein sworn and testified. FURTHER ORDERED, Judgment in the amount $3,668.975.00 and statutory interest pursuant to the lease agreement. Court DIRECTED counsel to submit an affidavit regarding attorneys fees and costs to include the Brunzell and Beattie factors. Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing Doc ID# 17 [17] Certificate of Mailing |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 16 [16] Notice of Hearing |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application for Examination of Judgment Debtor Doc ID# 15 [15] Application for Default Judgment Debtor Exam |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.