Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ransome, Charlene, filed a(n) Other Title To Property case represented by Michael J. Harker, against Collins, James, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Kephart, William D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
CategoryOther Title To Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Amended Stipulation and Order |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (Duplicate) Amended Stipulation and Order |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Preliminary Injunction in Order to Sell Property Court noted his concern with service in this matter. Mr. Harker advised he has the affidavit service which needs to be filed. Further, Mr. Harker advised he has spoken with Defendant who has no opposition and he will submit a Stipulation and Order today. COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED one week for Stipulation and Order. CONTINUED TO: 10/27/2020 9:00 AM Judge: Kephart, William D. |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Shortening Time | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Application for Order Shortening Time | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Preliminary Injunction in Order to Sell Property | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.