Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Payroll Funding Company Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Erven T. Nelson, against Beatty, Lance, Maintenance Builders Supply, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Miley, Stefany presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMiley, Stefany Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2020 |
CategoryCollection Of Accounts |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeConfession Of Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Doc ID# 8 [8] Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing The Court reviewed procedural history; ORDERED, CASE DISMISSED. Judge: Ballou, Erika |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing
Judge: Ballou, Erika |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Doc ID# 7 [7] Order to Show Cause |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Allowing Examination of Judgment Debtor Doc ID# 6 [6] Order Allwoing Examination of Judgment Debtor |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document Doc ID# 5 [5] Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Examination of Judgment Debtor Doc ID# 4 [4] Motion for Judgment Debtor Examination and Supplemental Proceedings |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 24 Judicial Reassignment to Judge Erika D. Ballou |
|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Doc ID# 3 [3] NOTICE OF JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure Doc ID# 1 [1] Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.