Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Kephart, William D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2020 |
CategoryNegligence - Other Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Order Judge: Gall, Maria |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call Vacated - per Order Judge: Gall, Maria |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Trial Readiness Vacated Judge: Gall, Maria |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call
Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call
Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order Doc ID# 33 Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Compliance Vacated - Case Closed Judge: Gall, Maria |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.