Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
D'Orsi, Antonio R, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Gerald I. Gillock, against Yee Advanced Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, Pc, Kuruvilla, Dpm, Thomman, represented by Robert C. Mcbride, Patricia Egan Daehnke, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Miley, Stefany presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMiley, Stefany Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2020 |
CategoryMalpractice - Medical/Dental |
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
STATUS CHECK: DISMISSAL The Status Check: Dismissal came before the Court on its September 9, 2022 chambers calendar. The Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of Defendant Yee Advanced Orthopedics was filed on August 3, 2022. The Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of Defendant Thomman Kuruvilla, D.P.M. was filed on August 23, 2022. Therefore, COURT ORDERED matter OFF CALENDAR and CASE CLOSED. CLERK'S NOTE: The above minute order has been distributed to all registered parties via Odyssey File and Serve. //gp 9-9-22 Judge: Roohani, Ellie |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry Doc ID# 82 [82] Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Dismiss Thomman Kuruvilla, D.P.M. with Prejudice |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Doc ID# 81 [81] Stipulation and Order to Dismiss Thomman Kuruvilla, D.P.M. with Prejudice |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - FIRM Vacated - per Judge Judge: Roohani, Ellie |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - FIRM
Judge: Roohani, Ellie |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order Doc ID# 80 [80] Notice Of Entry Of Stipulation And Order To Dismiss Yee Advanced Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, P.C. Dba Advanced Orthopedics & Sports Medicine Only With Prejudice |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Joinder to Motion in Limine Vacated - per Judge Judge: Roohani, Ellie |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - per Judge Judge: Roohani, Ellie |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Vacated - per Judge Judge: Roohani, Ellie |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Roohani, Ellie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.