Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2021 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedMarch 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Arbitration Hearing | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Discovery Order Amended Arbitration Discovery Order |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice to Appear for Arbitration Hearing Amended Notice to Appear for Arbitration Hearing |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Arbitration Discovery Order | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear for Arbitration Hearing | |
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Early Arbitration Conference Amended Notice of Early Arbitraiton Conference |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Early Arbitration Conference | |
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Appointment of Arbitrator | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Commissioners Decision on Request for Exemption - Denied Commissioner's Decision on Request for Exemption - Denied |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition to Request for Exemption Reply to Defendants Wiggets' Opposition to Plaitniff's Request for Exemption from Arbitration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.