Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Richardson, Carol, Richardson, Ana, Jones, Freddie, Jr., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Paul D. Powell, against Corral, Antonio, represented by Byron F. Browne, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Gayle Nathan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2020 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedMay 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Verdict - Short Jury Trial Verdict Form Short Jury Trial |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Short Trial - Jury PTJ Gayle Nathan |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury List | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service - Trial Subpoena to Antonio Corral | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Memorandum Plaintiffs' Pretrial Memorandum |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Short Trial Scheduling Order Order Setting Pretrial Conference and Discovery Deadlines |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Short Trial Setting | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Selection of Presiding Judge | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Trial De Novo | |
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Arbitrator's Decision on Request for Fees/Costs/Interest |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.