Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Archila Lopez, Maria Antonia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ramzy P. Ladah, against Litvinoff, Michael Bennet, represented by Benjamin J. Carman, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Krall, Nadia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Krall, Nadia |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Krall, Nadia |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Krall, Nadia |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Krall, Nadia |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 26 [26] Notice of Entry of Order |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Doc ID# 25 [25] Stipulation and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Krall, Nadia |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Earley, Kerry |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Krall, Nadia |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Earley, Kerry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.