Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Small Cap Compliance, Llc, filed a(n) Nrs Chapters 78-89 case represented by Peter L. Chasey, against China Changjiang Mining & New Energy Co., Ltd., in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryNrs Chapters 78-89 |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Discharging Custodian | |
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Small Cap Compliance, LLC's Motion to Terminate Custodianship Upon review of the papers and pleadings on file in this Matter, as proper service has been provided, this Court notes no opposition has been filed. Accordingly, pursuant to EDCR 2.20(e), the Motion to Terminate Custodianship is deemed unopposed. Therefore, good cause appearing, COURT ORDERED, motion is GRANTED. Moving Counsel is to prepare and submit an order within ten (10) days and distribute a filed copy to all parties involved in this matter. CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was distributed via electronic mail. / dr 5-4-20 Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Cusodian's Report Court notes motion to terminate custodianship for May 1, 2020. 5-1-20 CHAMBERS SMALL CAP COMPLIANCE, LLC'S MOTION TO TERMINATE CUSTODIANSHIP CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was distributed via electronic mail. / dr 4-13-20 Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Small Cap Compliance, LLC's Motion to Terminate Custodianship |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Report Custodian Status Report |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Check COURT NOTED no report submitted, ORDERED, matter CONTINUED for one week. 3-13-20 CHAMBERS STATUS CHECK: CUSTODIAN'S REPORT CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was distributed via electronic mail. / dr 3-9-20 Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.