Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lloyd, Seameah, filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case against Progressive Insurance Company, represented by John T. Keating, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Silva, Cristina D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition for Release of Funds in Blocked Account Petition for Early Release of funds |
|
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account The Status Check on Proof of Blocked Account came before this Court on the April 27, 2020, Chamber Calendar. Since sufficient proof of an established blocked account was filed with the court on March 10, 2020, COURT ORDERED, matter OFF CALENDAR and CASE CLOSED. Judge: Silva, Cristina D. |
|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Deposit | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Order Granting Amended Petition to Compromise Disputed Claim of Minor |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Petition to Compromise Disputed Claim of Minor | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Order Compromising Disputed Claim of Minor |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Petitioner for Minor's Compromise |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.