Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sellouk, David, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lawrence C. Hill, against Timput, Sakdina, represented by Ariel Clark Johnson, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Allf, Nancy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment Upon Arbitration Award |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment on Arbitration Award | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice To Prevailing Party Final Judgment May Be Entered Notice to Prevailing Party that Final Judgment may now be Entered on Arbitration Award |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arbitrators Bill for Fees and Costs ARBITRATOR S BILL FOR FEES AND COSTS |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Award ARBITRATION DECISION AND AWARD |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Arbitration Hearing | |
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Designation of Expert Witness Defendant's Expert Disclosure |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Arbitration Hearing Amended Notice of Arbitration Hearing |
|
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice to Appear for Arbitration Hearing Notice of Arbitration Hearing |
|
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Arbitration Discovery Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.