Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Han, Seung Hwan, filed a(n) Other Title To Property case represented by Donald H Williams, against Petroleum Technologies Inc, Draeger Construction Llc, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryOther Title To Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Seung Han, Plaintiff(s) vs. Petroleum Technologies Inc, Defendant(s) Motion for Order to Show Cause Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause as to why Petroleum Technologies, Inc., and Draeger Construction, LLC Liens Should Not Be Expunged Pursuant to NRS 108.2275 COURT NOTES the Order Granting Plaintiff s Motion for Order to Show Cause as to Why Petroleum Technologies, Inc. and Draeger Construction, LLC Liens Should not be Expunger Pursuant to NRS 108.2275 was filed 2/20/2020 and ORDERS, status check VACATED. CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order was electronically served by Court Clerk, P. Irby, to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve./pi 2-24-20 Judge: Crockett, Jim |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause as to Why Petroleum Technoligies, Inc., and Dreager Constrcution, LLC's Lien should not be expunged pursuant to 108.2275 |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause as to why Petroleum Technologies, Inc., and Draeger Construction, LLC Liens Should Not Be Expunged Pursaunt to NRS 108.2275 COURT NOTED, Mr.,. Starbuck did have the Order Show Cause served; there is not an affidavit of service on file to show service was made. Mr. Starbuck advised there was an filed Certificate of Mailings done. Mr. Starbuck further stated both of these entities are defunct. COURT ORDERED, MATTER CONTINUED to show that there has been proof of service on Defendants. Also, Mr. Starbuck to provide a proposed Order Show Cause by next date. 2-27-20 9:00 AM ORDER SHOW CAUSE Judge: Crockett, Jim |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for Order to Show Cause as to why Petroleum Technologies, Inc., and Draeger Construction, LLC Liens Should Not Be Expunged Pursaunt to NRS 108.2275 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.