Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Leblanc, Robert, filed a(n) General Securities - Securities case represented by Joseph R. Ganley, against De La Garza, Michael, Cipherloc Corporation, represented by Pro Se, Alexander L. Fugazzi, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategorySecurities (Nrs 90) |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaSecurities |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Securities |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial
Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call
Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check re Discovery/Case Status/Settlement Conference
Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Associate Counsel Vacated Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING TO PRACTICE | |
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Admitting to Practice | |
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Certificate of Service Amemded Certificate of Service |
|
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Admitting to Practice | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order re: Motion to Associate Counsel Having examined Plaintiff s Motion to Associate Jeffrey S. Taylor, Esq. filed on February 26, 2020, noting that service was effectuated upon the parties, no Opposition was filed thereto, and there being good cause, this Court ORDERS the Motion is GRANTED pursuant to EDCR 2.20(e). The matter scheduled for April 8, 2020 is VACATED pursuant to EDCR 2.23. Counsel is to prepare and submit a proposed Order to the Court within fourteen (14) days of this Minute Order pursuant to EDCR 7.21. CLERK S NOTE: This Minute Order has been electronically served to counsel through Odyssey eFile and by mail to Michael De La Garza [1245 Perlita, Irvine, CA 92618]. Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.