Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Starr, Troy, filed a(n) Workers Compensation - Labor and Employment case against Department Of Administration, Hearing Divison, Appeals Office, City Of Henderson, Cannon Cochran Management Solutions, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Kishner, Joanna S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryWorker'S Compensation Appeal |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeWorkers Compensation |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Denying Judicial Review |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Judicial Review of Administrative Decision Order Denying Petitioner's Petition for Judicial Review |
|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Denying Petitioner's Petition for Judicial Review | |
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition for Judicial Review Oral Argument and/or Decision Regarding the Petition for Judicial Review Ms. Anderson advised the Petition was filed to preserve certain rights of the Petitioner's treatment plan since an Order contained within the Decision stated the petitioner was not entitled to treatment for his cervical and thoracic spine strain; however, since there was no interruption in the Petitioner's care, Ms. Anderson submitted the matter and requested the Respondent prepare and Order affirming the appeals officer's decision. Upon Court's inquiry, Mr. Reeves concurred and advised an order could be prepared denying the Petition for Review based on the medical evidence. COURT ORDERED, based on the stipulation of the parties, the Court would not rule on the matter; Mr. Reeves to submit an Order consistent with today's hearing for review. Judge: Kishner, Joanna S. |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Hearing | |
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Respondent's Answering Brief | |
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petitioners Opening Brief Petitioner's Opening Brief A-19-807571-J |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Certification of Transmittal | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Transmittal of Record on Appeal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.