Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Armendariz, Tanya, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Sharon L. Nelson, against State Of Nevada Department Of Corrections, represented by Michelle D. Alanis, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Tara Clark Newberry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryEmployment Tort |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Doc ID# 14 [14] Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 21 Judicial Reassignment to Judge Tara Clark Newberry |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 13 [13] Notice of Entry of Order |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Removal Doc ID# 12 [12] Notice of Removal to Federal Court |
|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Removal to Federal Court | |
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Doc ID# 11 [11] Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Extending Time for Plaintiff to Serve Through June 15, 2020 |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Extending Time for Plaintiff to Serve Through June 15, 2020 |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Defendant State of Nevada Department of Corrections' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Insufficient Service of Process Counsel appearing via BlueJeans. Mr. Tan argued there was a failure to serve as only the Attorney General's office was served and the Department of Corrections (DOC) was not. Ms. Nelson argued NRCP 4.2D(6). Ms. Nelson further argued as to the shutdown period during COVID19 and the DOC had a sign on their door they were closed. COURT ORDERED, Defendant State of Nevada Department of Corrections' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Insufficient Service of Process DENIED and GRANTED Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to serve. Ms. Nelson to prepare the Order. Judge: Bonaventure, Joseph T. |
|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Doc ID# 10 [10] Affidavit of Service - State of Nevada - Department of Corrections |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.