Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Robinson, Octavius, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Pro Se, against Howell, Jerry, Nevada State Of, represented by Katrina Ann Samuels, Katrina A Samuels, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Erika D. Ballou presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2019 |
CategoryWrit Of Habeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 24 Judicial Reassignment to Judge Erika D. Ballou |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 6 [6] Notice of Entry of Order |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Decision and Order Doc ID# 5 [5] Decision and Order |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Decision and Order | |
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus COURT ORDERED the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, was hereby DENIED, FINDING the following: (1) Petitioner is not entitled to such credits as the Discharging Firearm at or into Occupied Structure, Vehicle, Aircraft or Watercraft and the Robbery with Use of a Deadly Weapon offenses fall under the exception for category B felonies pursuant to NRS 209.4465(8)(d); thus, deduction of statutory credit from Petitioner s minimum is prohibited; (2) Petitioner misunderstands the relevant statue; (3) there is no mandate for a 40% reduction; rather NRS 193.130(1) only indicates that the sentencing judge must impose a minimum sentence that is no more than 40% of the maximum sentence; (4) Petitioner committed the offense in 2018; (5) the decision in Williams does not affect crimes committed after 2007, after the effective date of the NRS 209.4465 amendment; (6) Petitioner s credit history shows that the Nevada Department of Corrections has awarded the Petitioner 20 good-time credits per month since he has been incarcerated; (7) the Nevada Department of Corrections has correctly applied such credits to his maximum because Petitioner is statutorily ineligible to have credits applied against his minimum; (8) Petitioner has failed to show he is entitled to any more good time credits than the Nevada Department of Corrections has awarded him; (9) Petitioner is not entitled to Work credit he did not earn; (10) further, a review of Petitioner s credit history shows that Petitioner has received all work credit Petitioner is entitled to; (11) Petitioner is subject to the restrictions under NRS 209.4465(8), because of the offense date; and (12) any disparate credit application due to differing offense dates does not result in an equal protection violation (See Vickers v. Dzurenda, 433 P. 3d 306 (Nev. App. 2018)); therefore applying the statute does not violate equal protection clause. CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was e-mailed to: Allison Herr, DAG [aherr@ag.nv.gov] and Rikki Garate, DAG [rgarate@ag.nv.gov]. A copy of this minute order was mailed to: Octavius Robinson #1214389 [Pioche Conservation Camp P.O. Box 509 Pioche, Nevada 89043]. (KD 7/1/20) Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response Doc ID# 4 [4] Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus | |
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Doc ID# 3 [3] Order for Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
|
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.