Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Powell, Joseph J, Powell, Paulina P, filed a(n) Other Tort case represented by Pro Se, against Christensen Arms, Colt Defense Llc, Colt'S Manufacturing Company Llc, Daniel Defense Inc, Discount Firearms And Ammo, (total of 12) See All represented by Ismail Amin, Jay J. Schuttert, John H. Mowbray, Patrick G. Byrne, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Escobar, Adriana presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2019 |
CategoryOther Tort |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissal Pursuant To Nrcp 41 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss
Judge: Escobar, Adriana |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Defendant Slide Fire Solutions, LP's Motion to Dismiss Judge: Escobar, Adriana |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Defendants Daniel Defense, LLC Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Judge: Escobar, Adriana |
|
October 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and Order For Extenson of Time for Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Certain Defendants(Third Request) |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Vacated - Duplicate Entry Judge: Escobar, Adriana |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and Order For Extension of Time For Plaintiffs to Respond to the Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Certain Defendants (Second Request) |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.