Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Leal, Maria Mendez, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Theodore P. Williams, against Silver Nugget Gaming, Llc., represented by Scott W. Ulm, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2019 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedMay 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Dismiss With Prejudice | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Stipulation and Order to Dismiss with Prejudice |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference Vacated Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference
Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents COURT NOTED no stipulation and order received, ORDERED, matter CONTINUED for 4 weeks. ...3-12-21 - CHAMBERS CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was distributed via Odyssey File and Serve. / dr 2-17-21 Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents COURT NOTED no stipulation and order received, ORDERED, matter CONTINUED for 4 weeks. ...3-12-21 - CHAMBERS CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was distributed via Odyssey File and Serve. / dr 2-17-21 Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.