Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Nevada Insurance Solutions, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dan M Winder, against Starlight Limousine Inc, Lee, Idelsy, Holst, Gerald R., represented by Brent T. Ellison, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2019 |
CategoryOther Contract |
Last RefreshedMay 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Short Trial - Bench PTJ Harry Paul Marquis |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
STP - Action Required Doc ID# 66 [66] STP - Action Required (settled) |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Presiding Short Trial Judges Bill for Fees and Costs Doc ID# 65 [65] Presiding Judge's Bill for Fees and Costs |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 64 [64] Short Trial Notice of Settlement |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Continue Short Trial Doc ID# 63 [63] Order Continuing Short Trial and Scheduling New Short Trial Date |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non Opposition Doc ID# 62 [62] Defendant Gerald Holst's Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery and Continue Trial Date |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Continue Trial Doc ID# 60 [60] Plaintiff Nevada Insurance Solutions' First Request to Extend Discovery and Continute Trial Date |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 61 [61] Short Trial Order Shortening Time |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Short Trial Discovery Order Doc ID# 59 [59] Short Trial Discovery Order |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 58 [58] Notice to Appear For Pre-Trial Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.