Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hernandez, Juan Carlos, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Nia C. Killebrew, against Aamer, Sidra, Rn, University Medical Center Of Southern Nevada, represented by Theodore Parker, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Sturman, Gloria presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2019 |
CategoryMalpractice - Medical/Dental |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 18 Pursuant to Administrative Order 22-14 - Reassigned to Judge Mary Kay Holthus |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Blocked Account Doc ID# 38 [38] Proof of Establishment of Funding Annuity |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 37 [37] Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Doc ID# 36 [36] Stipulation and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 35 [35] Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Reconsider September 3,2021 Order on Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim and for Order Mandating Defendant Comply with Funding the Aunnity on an Order Shortening Time, or in the Alternative Motion to Set Aside |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check Vacated Judge: Sturman, Gloria |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Reconsider to 9/3/21 Order Ms. Turfley stated they do not have a settlement agreement as they never entered into a structured settlement agreement. Ms. Killebrew stated counsel did not propose any other language and no good faith effort was made. Following arguments by counsel, Court advised it does not have anything in writing that Defendant did not know anything about the structured settlement agreement. Court advised if Ms. Turfley believed this was not the settlement agreement agreed upon, the alternative is to try the case and/or file a Motion to Enforce. COURT ORDERED, Motion to Reconsider, DENIED. Judge: Sturman, Gloria |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 33 [33] Instructions for Bluejeans Videoconference |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Doc ID# 34 [34] Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Reconsider September 3, 2021 Order on Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim and For Order Mandating Defendant to Comply with Funding the Annuity On An Order Shortening Time, or In the Alternative Motion to Set Aside |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - FIRM Vacated Judge: Sturman, Gloria |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.