Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gering, Antonio, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Amanda L. Laub, against Gleason, Jenna Irene, represented by Edward Randal Bond, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Escobar, Adriana presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2019 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Arbitrator's Decision on Request for Fees/Costs/Interest | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arbitrator's Decision Arbitration Decision |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Arbitration Award | |
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Arbitration Hearing | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Arbitration Hearing Date | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Extension of Time and Order Order Extending Time for Arbitration Hearing |
|
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear for Arbitration Hearing | |
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Arbitration Discovery Order | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Early Arbitration Conference Notice of Telephonic Early Arbitration Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.