Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Lujan, Hilda, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Richard A. Englemann, against Millard Mall Services Inc, Grand Canal Shops Ii Llc, represented by Jorge A. Ramirez, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Hardy, Joe presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2019 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedJune 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Instructions for Bluejeans Conference Doc ID# 96 [96] Instructions for BlueJeans Conference |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call
Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Check Court NOTED it received a notice of settlement. Mr. Pattillo stated he provided the release form to Plaintiff's counsel and requested the checks. Mr. Livingston stated he has not had an opportunity to review it with his client, and requested the matter be continued. COURT ORDERED, Status Check CONTINUED. CONTINUED TO: 5/31/2023 8:30 AM Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Check
Judge: Johnson, Susan |
|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Audiovisual Transmission Equipment Appearance Request Doc ID# 95 [95] DEFENDANTS GRAND CANAL SHOPS II, LLC and MILLARD MALL SERVICES, INC.S NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY SIMULTANEOUS AUDIOVISUAL TRANSMISSION EQUIPMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.