Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Kephart, William D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryNegligence - Other Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference
Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents
Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Trial Readiness
Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Trial Readiness Vacated Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Vacated Judge: Yeager, Bita |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.