Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Other Civil Matters case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Kephart, William D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil Matters |
Last RefreshedMay 28, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call
Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Trial Readiness
Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion U.S. Bank, National Association Motion to Claim Excess Proceeds Mr. Lawrence stated his opposition is moot. COURT ORDERED, U.S. Bank, National Association Motion to Claim Excess Proceeds GRANTED. Ms. Nielson to prepare the Order, distribute a copy to all parties, and submit to Chambers within 10 days. All orders are to be submitted to DC1Inbox@ClarkCountyCourts.us Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion U.S. Bank, National Association Motion to Claim Excess Proceeds Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply in Support of Motion to Claim Excess Proceeds | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Scheduling and Trial Order Scheduling Order and Order Setting Civil Jury Trial, Calendar Call and Pre-Trial Conference |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Defendant Terra S. Sousa's Opposition to U.S. Bank's Motion to Claim Excess Proceeds |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Rule 16 Conference Mr. Nielson advised the Plaintiff was previously dismissed out of the case. Colloquy regarding discovery date, trial estimate, and trial dates. COURT ORDERED, Trial Date SET and a Scheduling Order will ISSUE. 12/16/21 8:30 AM STATUS CHECK: TRIAL READINESS 1/20/22 8:30 AM PRETRIAL/CALENDAR CALL 2/07/22 1:30 PM JURY TRIAL Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Rule 16 Conference
Judge: Yeager, Bita |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.