Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Christy Craig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristy Craig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2019 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Craig, Christy |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Craig, Christy |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference
Judge: Craig, Christy |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Trial Readiness
Judge: Craig, Christy |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - Superseding Order Judge: Craig, Christy |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Craig, Christy |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - Superseding Order Judge: Craig, Christy |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Craig, Christy |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference Vacated - Superseding Order Judge: Craig, Christy |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference
Judge: Craig, Christy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.