Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank National Association, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Krista J. Nielson, against Hillebrand, Chris, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Jones, David M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJones, David M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2019 |
CategoryOther Real Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change Pursuant to Administrative Order 23-03 - Reassigned to Judge Jacob A. Reynolds Judge: ChangePursuant to Administrative Order 23-03 - Reassigned to Judge Jacob A. Reynolds |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Doc ID# 22 [22] Default Judgment |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Plaintiff's Amended Application for Default Judgment Testimony and exhibits presented (see worksheets). COURT ORDERED, Application for Judgment and declaration GRANTED in favor of the Plaintiff. Ms. Nielson to prepare the order. Judge: Jones, David M |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 21 [21] Notice of Hearing |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Affidavit Doc ID# 19 [19] Amended Affidavit in Support of Application for Default Judgment |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Application for Entry of Default Judgment Doc ID# 20 [20] Amended Application for Default Judgment |
|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Affidavit in Support of Application for Default Judgment | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Application for Entry of Default Judgment Amended Application for Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.