Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Paek, Chin Woo, filed a(n) Other Civil Matters case represented by Pro Se, against Clear Recon Corp, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Tara Clark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTara Clark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2019 |
CategoryOther Civil Matters |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Doc ID# 5 [5] Order for Dismissal without prejudice |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing Failure to prosecute Court noted no parties had checked in. Pursuant to the local rules for failure to prosecute, COURT ORDERED, case DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Court to prepare the order. Judge: Clark Newberry, Tara |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing Failure to prosecute Judge: Clark Newberry, Tara |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Doc ID# 4 [4] Order to Show Cause |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 21 Judicial Reassignment to Judge Tara Clark Newberry |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lis Pendens Doc ID# 2 [2] Notice of Lis Pendens |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Electronically Issued - Service Pending Doc ID# 3 [3] Summons |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint Doc ID# 1 [1] Complaint |
|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Electronically Issued - Service Pending Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.