Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Oviendo De Giron, Dennise, Giron, William D, filed a(n) Other Tort case represented by Mont E Tanner, against Valenzuela Solis, Olga Judith, Jimenez, Mario Mendez, Esparza, Jesus Montoy, represented by Michael F Bohn, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2019 |
CategoryOther Tort |
Last RefreshedAugust 18, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents Mr. Bohn indicated they received the appraisal back for the property yesterday much lower than anticipated. Mr. Bohn further indicated they are likely to have another appraisal done. Upon the Court's inquiry, Mr. Bohn indicated he emailed Defense Counsel last night but had not heard from him. Mr. Bohn requested a sixty days continuance. COURT ORDERED MATTER CONTINUED and Mr. Tanner to appear at the next hearing. CONTINUED TO 08/17/202209:00 AM Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference Vacated Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference
Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check Vacated Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Trial Readiness
Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Conference Mont Tanner, Esq. and Michael Bohn Esq. present via Bluejeans. Mr. Bohn represented this matter had been settled. Mr. Bohn further represented they had a settlement agreement but were working on the paperwork. Mr. Bohn requested to set this matter out ninety days. Mr. Tanner confirmed the representations of Mr. Bohn. COURT ORDERED, MATTER a Status Check regarding settlement shall be SET. 06/15/2022 09:00 AM STATUS CHECK:SETTLEMENT DOCUMENTATION Judge: Hardy, Joe |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.