Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shamte, Zewaitu, Taye, Gabriel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ramzy P. Ladah, against Uzueta-Salazar, Genaro, represented by Ariel Clark Johnson, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2019 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedMay 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Doc ID# 34 [34] Stipulation and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 35 [35] Notice of Entry of Order |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents
Judge: Holthus, Mary Kay |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Holthus, Mary Kay |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Holthus, Mary Kay |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Vacated Judge: Holthus, Mary Kay |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Holthus, Mary Kay |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Holthus, Mary Kay |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Doc ID# 32 [32] Notice of Settlement |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Scheduling Status Check Doc ID# 33 [33] ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CHECK: SETTLEMENT DOCUMENTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.