Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Kriehn, Jess Howard, filed a(n) Intentional Misconduct case represented by Pro Se, against Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, State Of Nevada, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Trevor L. Atkin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTrevor L. Atkin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 26, 2019 |
CategoryIntentional Misconduct |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Doc ID# 11 [11] Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 5 Judicial Reassignment to Judge Veronica M. Barisich |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition Doc ID# 10 [10] OPPOSITION TO DISMISSAL |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing Notice having been served, and there being no parties present, COURT ORDERS, CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Judge: Atkin, Trevor |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO DISMISSAL | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing
Judge: Atkin, Trevor |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
At Request of Court BlueJeans Notice for Department 8 on December 15, 2020 BLUEJEANS NOTICE for DEPT. 8 SHOW CAUSE HRGs/ STATUS CHECKS on - DEC 15, 2020, AT 9:00 AM and LAW AND MOTION CALENDAR DEC 15, 2020, AT 9:30 AMDepartment 8 Request to Appear TelephonicallyPursuant to Administrative Order 20-10, Department 8 will temporarily request all matters be heard via telephone conference ONLY. We will NOT be utilizing video conferencing. The court has set up an appearance through BlueJeans, which can accommodate multiple callers at no cost to participants. To use BlueJeans, please call in prior to the hearing at 1-888-748-9073.To connect to your hearing, simply input the assigned meeting ID number provided immediately below, followed by #.Your Meeting ID: 875 455 541 (NOTE: The meeting number will be different for each day's court session.)For your hearing, PLEASE observe the following protocol: Place your telephone on mute while waiting for your matter/case to be called. Do not place the conference on hold as it may play wait/hold music to others. Identify yourself before speaking each time as a record is being made. Please be mindful of sounds of rustling of papers or coughing. Judge: Atkin, Trevor |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Doc ID# 9 [9] Order to Show Cause |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Doc ID# 8 [8] Motion to Put on Calendar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.