Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ln Management Llc Series 7638 Sudan, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kerry P Faughnan, Esq, against Se'Villa Community Association, represented by Kurt R. Bonds, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Crockett, Jim presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCrockett, Jim Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 26, 2019 |
CategoryOther Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Hearing Vacated |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Appeal Statement | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Check Vacated Judge: Crockett, Jim |
|
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order USJR Statistical Closure: Motion to Dismiss by the Defendant(s) |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
ADR - Change of Status Change of Status - Case Dismissed |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
ADR - Action Required Action Required settled |
|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Se'Villa Community Association, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Or, Alternatively, Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings COURT ORDERED, April 14, 2020 hearing ADVANCED to Chamber Calendar on April 10, 2020. The Court is in agreement with Se Villa s Motion to Dismiss. As for the Plaintiff s First and Second Claims, Plaintiff s claims fail to state a valid basis for a claim based upon contract and likewise fail to assert a legitimate basis for a statutory duty as between Plaintiff and Defendant Se Villa. As to Plaintiff s third Claim, the Court agrees with Defendant Se Villa that there is no valid assertion of misrepresentation or fraud because the property was offered for sale without warranties or guarantees, as corroborated by the purchase prices at such non-judicial foreclosure sales typically being entirely inconsistent with the fair market value of a deed conveyance with warranties. Accordingly, after due consideration of the Motion to Dismiss, the Opposition and the Reply, COURT ORDERED, Motion to Dismiss GRANTED. Counsel for Se Villa to submit the appropriate order within 14 days per EDCR 7.21. 5/14/2020 STATUS CHECK: FILING OF ORDER (CHAMBERS) CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order was electronically served to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve. /rl 4/10/2020 Judge: Crockett, Jim |
|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reply in Support Se'Villa Community Association, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.