Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Kephart, William D. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference
Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enforce Plaintiff Dorothy Leker's Motion to Enforce Settlement and for Fees and Costs Incurred in having to Bring this Motion Judge: Yeager, Bita |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition to Motion to Enforce Settlement and for Fees and Costs incurred in Having to Bring this Motion | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Defendant's Limited Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement and for Fees and Costs |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Enforce Settlement and for Fees and Costs Incurred in having to Bring this Motion | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 1 Judicial Reassignment to Judge Bita Yeager |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Scheduling and Trial Order SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER SETTING CIVIL JURY TRIAL, PRE TRIAL AND CALENDAR CALL SCHEDULING ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.