Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chavez, Irma, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Steven Yeager, against Mcdonald'S Restaurants Of Nevada Inc, represented by Jack P. Burden, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Jones, Tierra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 3 Case Reassignment from Judge Tierra Jones to Judge Douglas W. Herndon |
|
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Blocked Account Notice of Blocked Trust Accounts |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account Following review of the papers and pleadings on file herein, COURT ORDERED, all requirements having not been met, matter is continued to January 24, 2019 in CHAMBERS. 01/24/19 (CHAMBERS) STATUS CHECK: BLOCKED ACCOUNT Clerk's Note: A copy of these minutes emailed to Mr. Yeager Esq., at syeager@awhlawyers.com /tb Judge: Jones, Tierra |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Stipulation & Order for Dismissal Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order re Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to EDCR 2.75 |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Stipulation and Order re Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to EDCR 2.75 |
|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Order | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filed Under Seal Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim Under Seal |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Motion To Seal Petition For Compromise Of Minor's Claim | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Status | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Arbitration File |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.