Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Yates, Shaun, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Andrew J. Glendon, against Page, Michael Le, Benchmark Properties Inc, Associations Inc, represented by Kurt R. Bonds, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Delaney, Kathleen E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2016 |
CategoryOther Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions
Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs [104] Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Doc ID# 111 [111] Declaration of Vincent J. Garrido, Esq. in Response to Plaintiff s Notice of Untimely Filing and Request to Strike |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Errata Doc ID# 112 [112] Errata to Defendants Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Retax Plaintiff's Motion to Retax Costs Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 110 [110] Notice Of Untimely Reply Filing And Request To Strike |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply in Support Doc ID# 109 [109] Reply in Support of Defendants Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Doc ID# 108 [108] Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Continuing Motion Hearing For the convenience of the Court, given the number of substantive matters otherwise pending on the Court s civil motion calendar, and the filing of a Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs by Defendant that is currently set to be heard on Tuesday, January 4, 2022, COURT ORDERED Plaintiff s Motion to Retax Costs set to be heard on Tuesday, December 21, 2021 is hereby continued, so all pending matters may be heard together on Tuesday, January 4, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. CLERK S NOTE: Copy of this Minute Order served on all counsel and pro se parties through the Court s electronic filing system. / aw 12/20/2021 Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Re: Dept. 25 Formal Request to Appear Remotely Please be advised that, in keeping with the directives set forth in the District Court s Administrative Orders issued in response to the COVID-19 pandemic, beginning Tuesday, January 12, 2021 Department 25 will require all Civil Calendar matters to be heard remotely, via the BlueJeans Conferencing System. The court is currently scheduling all video and telephonic conferences through BlueJeans, wherein a standard Meeting ID number has been issued, and counsel and/or the parties will connect for their respective sessions by audio/video or audio-only. To connect for an audio/video appearance (which is the Court s preference), copy the following link into your browser or simply enter the Meeting ID number in the application: https://bluejeans.com/633737743 To connect for an audio-only appearance, dial the telephone number below, then enter the Meeting ID number, followed by the # sign: Call-in number: 1-408-419-1715 Meeting ID number: 633737743 Again, until further notice, the Meeting ID number for all DC 25 Civil Calendars will be the same. Finally, PLEASE NOTE the following protocol each participant will be required to follow: Place your telephone on mute while waiting for your matter to be called. Do not place the conference on hold, as it may play wait/hold music. Identify yourself before speaking each time, as a record is being made. Please be mindful of ambient noises, e.g. rustling papers. [CLERK S NOTE: A copy of this Minute Order has been electronically served to all registered users in this case through the Eighth Judicial District Court Electronic Filing System.] aw 12/20/21 Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.