Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kozmary, Steven V, M.D., filed a(n) Other Business Court Matters case represented by Jeffrey R. Albregts, against Kidwell, Walter M, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2016 |
CategoryOther Business Court Matters |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissal Pursuant To Nrcp 41 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Status Check Vacated Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal | |
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service of Amended Complaint | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING... ...REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF WEST LAS VEGAS SURGERY CENTER, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT OR ALTERNATIVELY, STAY LITIGATION PENDING SATISFACTION OF MANDATORY PRE-LITIGATION MEDIATION OBLIGATION ON ORDER SHORTENING TIME... ... PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER PURSUANT TO NRCP 65, AND MOTIONS (1) FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO NRCP 65, AND (2) TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL PURSUANT TO NRPC 1.7, 1.9, AND 3.7 ON ORDER SHORTENING TIME Attorney Robert Schumacher, counsel for Defendant West Las Vegas Surgery Center, LLC, not present. Mr. Albregts advised they are fully resolved and simply need to deal with some things in the settlement agreement; they will be filing a stipulation for dismissal with the Court. COURT ORDERED, matter SET for status check on the Chambers calendar in two weeks. Mr. Albregts to notify Mr. Schumacher. 4-21-17 CHAMBERS STATUS CHECK: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL... ...PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING... ...REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF WEST LAS VEGAS SURGERY CENTER, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT OR ALTERNATIVELY, STAY LITIGATION PENDING SATISFACTION OF MANDATORY PRE-LITIGATION MEDIATION OBLIGATION ON ORDER SHORTENING TIME... ... PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER PURSUANT TO NRCP 65, AND MOTIONS (1) FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO NRCP 65, AND (2) TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL PURSUANT TO NRPC 1.7, 1.9, AND 3.7 ON ORDER SHORTENING TIME Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER PURSUANT TO NRCP 65, AND MOTIONS (1) FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO NRCP 65, AND (2) TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL PURSUANT TO NRPC 1.7, 1.9, AND 3.7 ON ORDER SHORTENING TIME... ...PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING... ...REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF WEST LAS VEGAS SURGERY CENTER, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT OR ALTERNATIVELY, STAY LITIGATION PENDING SATISFACTION OF MANDATORY PRE-LITIGATION MEDIATION OBLIGATION ON ORDER SHORTENING TIME Counsel advised they are working on settlement documents. Per counsel's request, COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED for two weeks. ...4-3-17 - 8:30 AM Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Injunction Hearing
Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration of Todd Cox, CPA In Support of WLVSC'S Objection to (and Request to Strike) Declaration of David J. Housey Supporting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions Vacated Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Clarification West Las Vegas Surgery Center, LLC's Motion for Clarification of Order Granting Stay Pending Satisfaction of Mandatory Pre-Litigation Mediation Obligation or, alternatively, to Extend Time for Individual Defendants, Walter M. Kidwell, Thomas F. Kelly, M.D., Ranadev Mukherjee, M.D., Jason E. Garber, M.d., and James S. Forage, M.D. to Respond to Complaint on Order Shortening Time APPEARANCES CONTINUED: Attorney Dylan Houston for Defendant West Las Vegas Surgery Center, LLC. COURT NOTED it does not believe the stay applies; however, based upon counsel's representation Mr. Albregts agrees he will not take default against the individuals until after mediation. Counsel advised they meet with Judge Wall tomorrow. Court noted parties need to be present. Defendant has five (5) days to respond if case does not settle tomorrow. Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.