Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gonzales, Jose, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Pro Se, against Williams, Warden, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2016 |
CategoryWrit Of Habeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Decision and Order | |
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus No parties present COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED as there has been no response by the Attorney General's office. CONTINUED TO 9/7/17 9:00 AM
Judge: Thompson, Charles |
|
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Order for Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - AB510 | |
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Vacated - Set in Error Judge: Bell, Linda Marie |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion and Order for Transportation of Inmate for Court Appearance or, In the Alternative, For Appearance by Telephonic or Video Conference | |
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Inmate Filed - Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Postconviction) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.