Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sallaberry, Brianna, filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case against Meyer, Elizabeth Ann, Allstate Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Bare, Rob presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2016 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney Pursuant to SCR 46 | |
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice Of Filing Evidence Of Court Blocked Trust Account | |
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account As proof of establishment of blocked account has not been provided, COURT ORDERED matter Status Check: Blocked Account currently set for March 8, 2017, shall be CONTINUED to May 10, 2017, in Chambers. Parties need not appear at the next Court date. CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of the foregoing minute order was distributed to the following party through the attorney folders located at the Regional Justice Center of: Parviz A. Heshmati Esq.(3-9-17 ks) Judge: Bare, Rob) 03/08/2017, 05/10/2017, 07/12/2017Status Check: Blocked Account Re: Order Approving Minor's Compromise (Dylin Sallaberry |
|
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Order Granting Petition for Compromise of Minor Dylin Sallaberry's Claim |
|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Petition For Compromise Of Minor Dylin Sallaberry's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.