Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ayele, Rachel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Marianne Y Denton, Esq, against Nguyen, Tinh, represented by Phillip R Emerson, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Scotti, Richard F. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Arbitration File | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Scotti, Richard F. |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Scotti, Richard F. |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference Vacated Judge: Scotti, Richard F. |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal and Return of Jury Fees | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Civil Jury Trial, Pre-Trial, and Calendar Call Order Setting Civil Jury Trial, Pre-Trial Conference and Calendar Call |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Trial Setting | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Defendant's Request for Trial De Novo filed 9/18/2017 and Demand for Removal from the Short Trial Program filed 9/29/2017 are hereby GRANTED as opposed pursuant to EDCR 2.20. Defendant is directed to submit a proposed order consistent with the foregoing within ten (10) days and distribute a filed copy to all parties involved pursuant to EDCR 7.21. Such order should set forth a synopsis of the circumstances and authority justifying the requested relief. The Status Check scheduled for 1/03/2018, 9:00am is hereby VACATED. CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order was electronically served by Courtroom Clerk, Denise Duron, to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve. (dd-1/2/18) Judge: Scotti, Richard F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.