Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hargreaves, Jennifer, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Karen H. Ross, against Toll Bros Inc, represented by Donald A. Lattin, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Bluth, Jacqueline M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence - Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Bluth, Jacqueline M. |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Bluth, Jacqueline M. |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Status Check Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Bluth, Jacqueline M. |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change To Judge Jacqueline M. Bluth Judge: ChangeTo Judge Jacqueline M. Bluth |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Early Case Conference List of Documents Plaintiff's Third Supplement to Initial Early Case Conference List of Witness and Production of Documents |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Setting Civil Jury Trial and Calendar Call | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Discovery Conference Vacated - per Commissioner Judge: Bulla, Bonnie |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order | |
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.