Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rumbaugh, Michael, Rumbaugh, Deborah, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Ronald Colquitt, against State Farm Fire And Casualty Company, represented by Martin J. Kravitz, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Villani, Michael presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2016 |
CategoryInsurance Carrier |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2020 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 18 Judicial Reassignment - From Judge Villani to Judge Holthus |
|
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Arbitration File | |
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Order Granting Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's Motion to Enforce Settlement and Denying Plaintiffs Michael and Deborah Rumbaugh's Countermotion to Enforce Settlement |
|
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enforce Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's Motion to Enforce Settlement Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company s Motion to Enforce Settlement came before this Court on the August 9, 2017, Chamber Calendar. This Court, having reviewed the pleadings and papers on file rules as follows: When a party fails to accept an offer and a subsequent offer is made, the prior offer is deemed to be revoked. Pravorne v. McLeod, 383 P.2d 855, 855, 79 Nev. 341, 342 (Nev.1963) (internal quotation marks and citation omitted) (citing Doud v. Yellow Cab of Reno, Inc., 3:13-CV-00664-WGC, 2015 WL 4874701, at *11 (D. Nev. Aug. 14, 2015). In the instant matter, the February 20, 2017 offer was rejected by Plaintiffs April 10, 2017 Offer of Judgment. Any subsequent offer revoked a prior offer. Further, Defendant s April 25, 2017 Offer of Judgment was clear an unambiguous in its terms by referencing all claims. Nothing in the Offer of Judgment indicates it should be read in conjunction with the February 20, 2017 offer. Moreover, Plaintiffs acceptance of this Offer of Judgment was also a clear and unambiguous assent to the terms. A settlement agreement is a contract and is therefore governed by contract law. May v. Anderson, 121 Nev. 668, 119 P.3d 1254 (2005). When analyzing contract principals, a Court does not go outside the four corners of the document unless the terms are vague and unambiguous. Here, the Court finds that the Offer of Judge was neither vague nor ambiguous. Therefore, COURT ORDERED Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company s Motion to Enforce Settlement GRANTED. Counsel for Defendant is directed to submit a proposed order consistent with the foregoing within ten (10) days after counsel is notified of the ruling and distribute a filed copy to all parties involved pursuant to EDCR 7.21. Such Order should set forth a synopsis of the supporting reasons proffered to the Court in briefing and be approved as to form and content by all parties. CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was placed in the attorney folder(s) of Ronald Colquitt, Esq. and Martin Kravitz, Esq.//ob/08/29/17. Judge: Villani, Michael |
|
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions Vacated Judge: Villani, Michael |
|
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition and Countermotion Plaintiffs' Opposition and Countermotion to Enforce Settlement Agreement Plaintiff's Countermotion to Enforce Settlement came before this Court on the August 9, 2017, Chamber Calendar. This Court, having reviewed the pleadings and papers on file rules as follows: The Court previously entered a minute order granting Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's Motion to Enforce Settlement. Therefore, based upon the ruling in the prior minute order, Plaintiff s Countermotion to Enforce Settlement is DENIED. Counsel for Defendant is directed to submit a proposed order consistent with the foregoing within ten (10) days after counsel is notified of the ruling and distribute a filed copy to all parties involved pursuant to EDCR 7.21. Such Order should set forth a synopsis of the supporting reasons proffered to the Court in briefing and be approved as to form and content by all parties. CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was placed in the attorney folder(s) of Ronald Colquitt, Esq. and Martin Kravitz, Esq.//ob/08/29/17. Judge: Villani, Michael |
|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Reply in Support Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's Reply in Support of Motion to Enforce Settlement and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Settlement |
|
July 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Opposition and Countermotion to Enforce Settlement Agreement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.