Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rezai, Lailey, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael D. Mazur, Esq, against Germ Terminator Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Crockett, Jim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2016 |
CategoryOther Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents Vacated - Case Closed Judge: Crockett, Jim |
|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal Stipulation and Order ofDismissal |
|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Defendants James Song s and Adrienne Song s Motion to Set Aside Default | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Order Granting James Song's and Adrienne Song's Motion To Set Aside Default |
|
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Consolidate Defendant James Song's Motion to Consolidate Court Finds pursuant to the rules, this motion is premature. Argument by counsel. Colloquy regarding Rule 12(b)(5) motions. COURT ORDERS, Motion to Consolidate is DENIED Without Prejudice. Mr. Schnitzer to prepare the order within 10 days have opposing counsel review as to form and content and distribute a filed copy to all parties involved in this matter. Judge: Bailus, Mark B |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Supplemental to Defendants James Song's and Adrienne Song's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default | |
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition Defendant James Song's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Consolidate |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Opposition to Motion to Consolidate | |
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief RE: Issues Raised in Defendants' Reply |
|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.