Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Republic Services Inc, filed a(n) Other Title To Property case represented by Donald H Williams, against Dorsey, Harold A, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Hardy, Joe presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2016 |
CategoryOther Title To Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order For Dismissal Without Prejudice Order |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing Mr. Starbuck advised that the Defendants had signed a promissory note with a year-long payment schedule; however, a Confession of Judgment had not been signed. Due to the circumstances of the case, Mr. Starbuck requested that the case remain open in order for the payments to be monitored, and that a status check be set approximately three to four months from the instant hearing. COURT ORDERED the instant matter was hereby CONTINUED, DIRECTING Plaintiff's counsel to file a response to the Order To Show Cause prior to the continuation date. CONTINUED TO: 3/14/18 9:00 AM Judge: Hardy, Joe |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service of Pauline Dorsey | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Harold A. Dorsey |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Foreclosure of Lien | |
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Lis Pendens | |
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.