Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vip Primary Care, Contreras, Julie, Akioyame, Franklin, filed a(n) Other Civil Matters case represented by Augusta A Massey, against Prock, Dona J., represented by Craig Roulet Delk, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Williams, Timothy C. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2016 |
CategoryOther Civil Matters |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeSummary Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Arbitration File | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Order re Motion for Summary Judgment | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice Of Entry Of Order Granting Stipulation And Order For Dismissal Without Prejudice | |
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation And Order For Dismissal Without Prejudice | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Defendant Dona J. Prock's Motion for Summary Judgement Re: Defamation Following arguments by counsel as to admissible evidence, facts and discovery. COURT ORDERED, motion GRANTED IN PART as to tortious interference and discrimination. Following arguments regarding the statute as it pertains to peace officers, Court stated it would rule after discovery closes. COURT ORDERED, summary judgment motion CONTINUED as to defamation. CONTINUED to: 8/17/17 9:00 AM Judge: Williams, Timothy C. |
|
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date | |
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Reply in Support Defendant, Dona J. Prock s Reply In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment |
|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date | |
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.