Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Royse, Cynthia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Scott Poisson, against Safeco Insurance Company Of Illinois, Barron, Lauren, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Allf, Nancy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order to Dismiss All Claims Against Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois as Defendant and Intervenor on the Behalf of Lauren Barron | |
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order | |
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Ciivl Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents COURT FINDS after review that at the hearing on January 22, 2019 the Notice of Settlement was filed with the Court indicating that a settlement in this matter had been reached. A Status Check was set on Chambers Calendar for April 9, 2019. COURT ORDERS for good cause appearing and after review that due to the notification of settlement the case will be CLOSED and the Status Check set for April 9, 2019 on Chambers Calendar is hereby VACATED. CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was faxed to: Bernstein & Poisson (702-256-6280) and Koeller Nebeker Carlson & Haluck, LLP (702-853-5599) Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Vacated Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Vacated Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Pretrial/Calendar Call Vacated Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Vacated - Set in Error Judge: Allf, Nancy |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment to Enforce Limits Judge: Allf, Nancy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.