Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Broderdorf, Jennifer, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jason C Kolbe, against Liberty, Joy, represented by Kylie Foster, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Williams, Timothy C. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment Upon Arbitration Award |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 13 [13] Notice of Entry of Order |
|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
July 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Arbitration File Doc ID# 11 [11] Arbitration File |
|
July 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Arbitration File | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Arbitration Award Doc ID# 12 [12] Plainitff Jennifer Broderdorf's Judgement on Arbitration Award |
|
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Arbitration Award Plainitff Jennifer Broderdorf's Judgement on Arbitration Award |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Doc ID# 10 [10] Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice To Prevailing Party Final Judgment May Be Entered Doc ID# 9 [9] Notice to Prevailing Party that Final Judgment may now be Entered on Arbitration Award |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice To Prevailing Party Final Judgment May Be Entered Notice to Prevailing Party that Final Judgment may now be Entered on Arbitration Award |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.